Web1988, Posch & Partners (at that time Posch&Comp.) was established at the initiative of Hannes Posch. 1993, Fritz Schwaiger, who had joined the company in 1989, became shareholder and Managing ... WebSquad SV Thaur This page displays a detailed overview of the club's current squad. It shows all personal information about the players, including age, nationality, contract duration and market value. It also contains a table with average age, cumulative market value and average market value for each player position and overall.
SV Thaur - Club profile Transfermarkt
WebPosch & Partners was founded in 1988 on the initiative of Hannes Posch. Fritz Schwaiger joined the company in 1989 and became Managing Director in 1993. When Hannes Posch retired in 2006, Fritz Schwaiger took over company ownership and Erich Kaschka, a senior staff member of P&P, was entrusted full management responsibilities with executive power. WebSV THAUR, Thaur, Austria. 1,111 likes · 121 talking about this. Herzlich Willkommen! Dies ist der offizielle Facebook-Auftritt des Sportverein THAUR. hcs 2204
Hannes Posch - Spelersprofiel Transfermarkt
WebChristian Kohlmayer. geboren am 15.03.1983 in Villach. gestorben am 05.04.2024 in Molzbichl. Aufbahrung: 11.04.2024 um 10.00 Uhr im Zeremonium der Bestattung Kärnten. WebApr 6, 1992 · Geburtsdatum: 06.04.1992 Alter: 30 Nationalität: Österreich Position: Torwart Aktueller Verein: SV Thaur Im Team seit: 01.07.2024 Vertrag bis:- Transferhistorie Saison WebJul 10, 2024 · SV Thaur. Beim Verein seit: 10.07.2024. spielt aktuell in folgenden Bewerben: Landesliga West . Kerschdorfer Tirol-Cup . 7 Tore. 61 Siege. 33 Unentschieden. ... Erfolge Hannes Posch . Saison Saison. Ziel Ziel. Verein Verein. 2024/22. 12. Platz in Landesliga West. SV Thaur. 2024/22. Vizemeister Landesliga Ost. FC Buch. 2016/17. 14. Platz in ... golden accommodations